HI HR87 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on April 3 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-04-03 - Resolution adopted in final form.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on April 3 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-04-03 - Resolution adopted in final form.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Urging The Director Of Health To Convene A Task Force To Assess The Scope And Feasibility Of Establishing An Emergency Services Patient Advocate Program.
Title
Emergency Services Patient Advocate Program
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-04-03 | House | Resolution adopted in final form. |
2014-04-03 | House | Adopted with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Cachola, Carroll, Oshiro, Say excused (4). |
2014-04-03 | House | Re-referred to HLT, referral sheet 49 |
2014-03-21 | House | Report adopted. referred to the committee(s) on CPC as amended in HD 1 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Takai, Tokioka, Yamane excused (3). |
2014-03-21 | House | Reported from HLT (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1222-14) as amended in HD 1, recommending referral to CPC. |
2014-03-19 | House | The committees on HLT recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 7 Ayes: Representative(s) Belatti, Morikawa, Creagan, Kobayashi, Oshiro, Woodson, Matsumoto; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 3 Excused: Representative(s) Carroll, Hashem, Jordan. |
2014-03-17 | House | Resolution scheduled to be heard by HLT on Wednesday, 03-19-14 8:30AM in conference room 329. |
2014-03-12 | House | Referred to HLT, CPC, FIN, referral sheet 33 |
2014-03-07 | House | Offered |
Same As/Similar To
HCR122 (Same As) 2014-04-24 - Resolution adopted in final form.