HI HR85 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on April 12 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-04-12 - Resolution adopted in final form.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on April 12 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-04-12 - Resolution adopted in final form.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Requesting The Auditor To Conduct A Study On The Potential Effects Of Allowing Graduate Students Of The University Of Hawaii To Unionize.
Title
University of Hawaii; Graduate Student; Union
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-04-12 | House | Resolution adopted in final form. |
2013-04-12 | House | Adopted with Ward voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Har, McDermott, Oshiro, Tokioka excused (4). |
2013-04-12 | House | Reported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1652), recommending adoption. |
2013-04-10 | House | The committees on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 16 Ayes: Representative(s) Luke, Nishimoto, Johanson, Hashem, Ing, Kobayashi, Lowen, Onishi, Takayama, Tokioka, Woodson, Yamashita, Fukumoto; Ayes with reservations: Representative(s) Cullen, Jordan, Ward; 0 Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Morikawa. |
2013-04-08 | House | Scheduled for decision making on Wednesday, 04-10-13 3:15PM in conference room 308. |
2013-03-28 | House | Report adopted; referred to the committee(s) on FIN with Representative(s) Ward voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Belatti, Ito, C. Lee, Tokioka excused (4). |
2013-03-28 | House | Reported from LAB/HED (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1257), recommending referral to FIN. |
2013-03-22 | House | The committees on HED recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 6 Ayes: Representative(s) Choy, Ichiyama, Nakashima, Ohno, Takai, Cheape; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 4 Excused: Representative(s) Aquino, Hanohano, Takumi, Fale. |
2013-03-22 | House | The committees on LAB recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 6 Ayes: Representative(s) Nakashima, Hashem, Ichiyama, Ing, Yamashita, Johanson; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 3 Excused: Representative(s) Aquino, Takumi, Yamane. |
2013-03-20 | House | Resolution scheduled to be heard by LAB/HED on Friday, 03-22-13 11:30AM in conference room 309. |
2013-03-20 | House | Re-referred to LAB/HED, FIN, referral sheet 41 |
2013-03-14 | House | Referred to LAB, HED, FIN, referral sheet 37 |
2013-03-13 | House | Offered |
2013-03-12 | House | To be offered. |
Same As/Similar To
HCR114 (Same As) 2013-04-15 - Referred to HRE/JDL/WAM.
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=HR&billnumber=85&year=2013 |
Text | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2013/Bills/HR85_.HTM |