HI HR8 | 2020 | Regular Session

Note: Carryover of previous HR8

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-1)
Status: Introduced on January 17 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-16 - This measure has been deleted from the meeting scheduled on Thursday 03-19-20 9:00AM in conference room 325.
Pending: House Energy & Environmental Protection Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Urging The State To Ban Single-use Plastic Goods And Plastic Bags And To Set A Sustainability Example By Eliminating The Use Of Single-use Plastic Tableware At State Department Meetings And Functions.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Urging The State To Ban Single-use Plastic Goods And Plastic Bags And To Set A Sustainability Example By Eliminating The Use Of Single-use Plastic Tableware At State Department Meetings And Functions.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2020-03-16HouseThis measure has been deleted from the meeting scheduled on Thursday 03-19-20 9:00AM in conference room 325.
2020-03-13HouseResolution scheduled to be heard by EEP on Thursday, 03-19-20 9:00AM in conference room 325.
2020-03-10HouseReferred to EEP, JUD, referral sheet 39
2020-01-21HouseOffered
2020-01-17HouseTo be offered.

Same As/Similar To

HCR10 (Same As) 2020-03-16 - This measure has been deleted from the meeting scheduled on Thursday 03-19-20 9:00AM in conference room 325.
HR8 (Carry Over) 2019-01-24 - Resolution adopted in final form.

Subjects


Hawaii State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback