HI HCR10 | 2020 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous HCR10
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-1)
Status: Introduced on January 17 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-16 - This measure has been deleted from the meeting scheduled on Thursday 03-19-20 9:00AM in conference room 325.
Pending: House Energy & Environmental Protection Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 17 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-16 - This measure has been deleted from the meeting scheduled on Thursday 03-19-20 9:00AM in conference room 325.
Pending: House Energy & Environmental Protection Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Urging The State To Ban Single-use Plastic Goods And Plastic Bags And To Set A Sustainability Example By Eliminating The Use Of Single-use Plastic Tableware At State Department Meetings And Functions.
Title
Urging The State To Ban Single-use Plastic Goods And Plastic Bags And To Set A Sustainability Example By Eliminating The Use Of Single-use Plastic Tableware At State Department Meetings And Functions.
Sponsors
Rep. John Mizuno [D] | Rep. Richard Creagan [D] | Rep. Nicole Lowen [D] | Rep. Amy Perruso [D] |
Rep. Cynthia Thielen [R] | Rep. Tina Wildberger [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-16 | House | This measure has been deleted from the meeting scheduled on Thursday 03-19-20 9:00AM in conference room 325. |
2020-03-13 | House | Resolution scheduled to be heard by EEP on Thursday, 03-19-20 9:00AM in conference room 325. |
2020-03-10 | House | Referred to EEP, JUD, referral sheet 39 |
2020-01-21 | House | Offered |
2020-01-17 | House | To be offered. |
Same As/Similar To
HR8 (Same As) 2020-03-16 - This measure has been deleted from the meeting scheduled on Thursday 03-19-20 9:00AM in conference room 325.
HCR10 (Carry Over) 2019-03-21 - Report adopted; referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) Thielen, Wildberger voting no (2) and Representative(s) Belatti, Cabanilla Arakawa, Holt, Tokioka, Yamane excused (5).
HCR10 (Carry Over) 2019-03-21 - Report adopted; referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) Thielen, Wildberger voting no (2) and Representative(s) Belatti, Cabanilla Arakawa, Holt, Tokioka, Yamane excused (5).
Subjects
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=HCR&billnumber=10&year=2020 |
Text | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2020/bills/HCR10_.HTM |