HI HR72 | 2020 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous HR72
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 14-0)
Status: Introduced on March 4 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-11 - Referred to TRN, FIN, referral sheet 40
Pending: House Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 4 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-11 - Referred to TRN, FIN, referral sheet 40
Pending: House Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Urging The County Planning Departments To Provide Notice Of Traffic Flow Changes And Consider The Placement Of Utility Poles Prior To Approving Any Development.
Title
Urging The County Planning Departments To Provide Notice Of Traffic Flow Changes And Consider The Placement Of Utility Poles Prior To Approving Any Development.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-11 | House | Referred to TRN, FIN, referral sheet 40 |
2020-03-05 | House | Offered |
2020-03-04 | House | To be offered. |
Same As/Similar To
HCR91 (Same As) 2020-03-11 - Referred to TRN, FIN, referral sheet 40
HR72 (Carry Over) 2019-03-14 - Referred to LHE, FIN, referral sheet 33
HR72 (Carry Over) 2019-03-14 - Referred to LHE, FIN, referral sheet 33
Subjects
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=HR&billnumber=72&year=2020 |
Text | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2020/bills/HR72_.HTM |