HI HR72 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 20-0)
Status: Introduced on March 6 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-03-19 - Re-referred to AGR, FIN, referral sheet 37
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 6 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-03-19 - Re-referred to AGR, FIN, referral sheet 37
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Requesting That The Department Of Land And Natural Resources, Department Of Agriculture, And Agribusiness Development Corporation Collaborate To Control The Statewide Proliferation Of Feral Pigs.
Title
Requesting state agencies to collaborate to control feral pigs.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-03-19 | House | Re-referred to AGR, FIN, referral sheet 37 |
2014-03-11 | House | Referred to AGR, WAL, FIN, referral sheet 32 |
2014-03-07 | House | Offered |
2014-03-06 | House | To be offered. |
Same As/Similar To
HCR98 (Same As) 2014-03-20 - The committee(s) on AGR recommend(s) that the measure be deferred.
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=HR&billnumber=72&year=2014 |
Text | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2014/bills/HR72_.HTM |