HI HR57 | 2020 | Regular Session

Note: Carryover of previous HR57

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 31-1)
Status: Introduced on March 3 2020 - 25% progression
Action: 2020-03-10 - Referred to HLT/HSH, FIN, referral sheet 39
Pending: House Health Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Requesting The Department Of Health To Prioritize The Containment And Control Of Covid-19 To Those With A High Probability Of Contracting And Dying From The Virus, Such As The Residents Of Care Homes, Nursing Homes, And Adult Foster Homes, Their Caregivers, And People With Known Comorbid Medical Conditions.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Requesting The Department Of Health To Prioritize The Containment And Control Of Covid-19 To Those With A High Probability Of Contracting And Dying From The Virus, Such As The Residents Of Care Homes, Nursing Homes, And Adult Foster Homes, Their Caregivers, And People With Known Comorbid Medical Conditions.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2020-03-10HouseReferred to HLT/HSH, FIN, referral sheet 39
2020-03-05HouseOffered
2020-03-03HouseTo be offered.

Same As/Similar To

HR57 (Carry Over) 2019-04-04 - Resolution adopted in final form.

Subjects


Hawaii State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback