HI HR56 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 20-0)
Status: Passed on March 27 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-03-27 - Resolution adopted in final form.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 20-0)
Status: Passed on March 27 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-03-27 - Resolution adopted in final form.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Requesting The Department Of Health To Convene A Stakeholder Working Group To Make Recommendations To Enhance Meaningful Access To Health Care In The State Through The Provision Of Language Assistance Services.
Title
Requesting The Department Of Health To Convene A Stakeholder Working Group To Make Recommendations To Enhance Meaningful Access To Health Care In The State Through The Provision Of Language Assistance Services.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-03-27 | House | Resolution adopted in final form. |
2024-03-27 | House | Adopted as amended in HD 1 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Ganaden, Gates, Kapela, La Chica, Nakashima, Nishimoto, Quinlan, Sayama, Tam excused (9). |
2024-03-27 | House | Reported from HLT (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1455-24) as amended in HD 1, recommending adoption. |
2024-03-20 | House | The committee on HLT recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 7 Ayes: Representative(s) Belatti, Takenouchi, Amato, Ilagan, Marten, Nishimoto, Garcia; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Kobayashi. |
2024-03-18 | House | Resolution scheduled to be heard by HLT on Wednesday, 03-20-24 10:30AM in conference room 329 VIA VIDEOCONFERENCE. |
2024-03-08 | House | Referred to HLT, referral sheet 18 |
2024-03-07 | House | Offered |
2024-03-06 | House | To be offered. |
Same As/Similar To
HCR71 (Same As) 2024-05-01 - Received notice of Adoption in House (Hse. Com. No. 826).
Subjects
Access to Health Care
Department of Health
Language Access Services
Limited English Proficiency (LEP)
Report.
Stakeholder Working Group
Department of Health
Language Access Services
Limited English Proficiency (LEP)
Report.
Stakeholder Working Group