HI HR43 | 2022 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous HR43
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-0)
Status: Passed on April 4 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-04-04 - Resolution adopted in final form.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-0)
Status: Passed on April 4 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-04-04 - Resolution adopted in final form.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Requesting The Public Utilities Commission To Consider Efforts To Mitigate High Energy Burdens For Low- And Moderate-income Customers And Input By The Consumer Advocate And Investigate How To Integrate Considerations Of Energy Equity And Justice Across Its Work.
Title
Requesting The Public Utilities Commission To Consider Efforts To Mitigate High Energy Burdens For Low- And Moderate-income Customers And Input By The Consumer Advocate And Investigate How To Integrate Considerations Of Energy Equity And Justice Across Its Work.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-03-24 - House - House Energy & Environmental Protection: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-04-04 | House | Resolution adopted in final form. |
2022-04-04 | House | Adopted as amended in HD 1 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Gates, McDermott excused (2). |
2022-04-04 | House | Reported from EEP (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1668-22) as amended in HD 1, recommending adoption. |
2022-03-24 | House | The committees on EEP recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 8 Ayes: Representative(s) Lowen, Marten, Hashem, Matayoshi, Perruso, Todd, Tokioka, Matsumoto; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and Excused: none. |
2022-03-17 | House | Resolution scheduled to be heard by EEP on Thursday, 03-24-22 10:00AM in conference room 325 Via Videoconference. |
2022-03-14 | House | Referred to EEP, referral sheet 27 |
2022-03-10 | House | Offered |
2022-03-09 | House | To be offered. |
Same As/Similar To
HCR48 (Same As) 2022-04-05 - Referred to CPN/EET.
HR43 (Carry Over) 2021-03-23 - Report adopted; referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) McDermott excused (1).
HR43 (Carry Over) 2021-03-23 - Report adopted; referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) McDermott excused (1).