HI HR39 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 13-5)
Status: Introduced on February 10 2010 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-03-08 - (H) The committee(s) recommends that the measure be deferred.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 10 2010 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-03-08 - (H) The committee(s) recommends that the measure be deferred.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Requesting The Governor Of The State Of Hawaii To Approve The Establishment Of A Sister State Relationship Between The State Of Hawaii And The Riau Islands Province Of Indonesia.
Title
Riau Islands; Sister-State approval; request
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-03-08 | (H) The committee(s) recommends that the measure be deferred. | |
2010-03-04 | (H) Resolution scheduled to be heard by TCI on Monday, 03-08-10 9:30AM in conference room 312. | |
2010-02-12 | (H) Referred to TCI, FIN, referral sheet 27 | |
2010-02-11 | (H) Offered | |
2010-02-10 | (H) To be offered. |
Same As/Similar To
HCR83 (Same As) 2010-03-08 - (H) The committee(s) recommends that the measure be deferred.
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://capitol.hawaii.gov/Archives/measure_indiv_Archives.aspx?billtype=HR&billnumber=39&year=2010 |
Text | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2010/Bills/HR39_.HTM |