HI HR24 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 22-3)
Status: Introduced on February 26 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-03-13 - The committee(s) on HLT recommend(s) that the measure be deferred.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 26 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-03-13 - The committee(s) on HLT recommend(s) that the measure be deferred.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Urging The Department Of Health To Require That Medical Care Professionals Provide Information On Prenatal Screening And Testing For Down Syndrome To All Pregnant Women.
Title
Prenatal Testing; Down Syndrome; Department of Health; Abortion Study; Education; Awareness; Disclosure
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-03-13 | House | The committee(s) on HLT recommend(s) that the measure be deferred. |
2015-03-11 | House | Scheduled for decision making on Friday, 03-13-15 11:30AM in conference room 329. |
2015-03-11 | House | The committee(s) on HLT recommend(s) that the measure be deferred until 03-11-15 11:30am. |
2015-03-09 | House | Resolution scheduled to be heard by HLT on Wednesday, 03-11-15 9:00AM in conference room 329. |
2015-03-05 | House | Referred to HLT, FIN, referral sheet 28 |
2015-03-05 | House | Offered |
2015-02-26 | House | To be offered. |
Same As/Similar To
HCR54 (Same As) 2015-03-13 - The committee(s) on HLT recommend(s) that the measure be deferred.
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=HR&billnumber=24&year=2015 |
Text | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2015/bills/HR24_.HTM |