HI HR23 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 25-4)
Status: Passed on March 31 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-03-31 - Resolution adopted in final form.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 25-4)
Status: Passed on March 31 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-03-31 - Resolution adopted in final form.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Urging Congress, as well as Hawaii's Congressional delegation, to support the Veterans Health and Benefits Improvement Act of 2013, particularly the section providing those serving in the National Guard with veteran status.
Title
Urging Congress, as well as Hawaii's Congressional delegation, to support the Veterans Health and Benefits Improvement Act of 2013, particularly the section providing those serving in the National Guard with veteran status.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-03-31 | House | Resolution adopted in final form. |
2014-03-31 | House | Adopted with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Carroll, Hashem excused (2). |
2014-03-31 | House | Reported from VMI (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1352-14), recommending adoption. |
2014-03-12 | House | The committees on VMI recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 10 Ayes: Representative(s) Takai, Ito, Awana, Brower, Cachola, Choy, Ohno, Onishi, Tsuji, Wooley; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) McDermott. |
2014-03-11 | House | Broadcast of hearing/briefing available. See: www.capitoltv.org |
2014-03-07 | House | Resolution scheduled to be heard by VMI on Wednesday, 03-12-14 8:30AM in conference room 312. |
2014-02-18 | House | Referred to VMI, referral sheet 23 |
2014-02-13 | House | Offered |
2014-02-12 | House | To be offered. |
Same As/Similar To
HCR42 (Same As) 2014-04-08 - Referred to PSM, WAM.
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=HR&billnumber=23&year=2014 |
Text | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2014/bills/HR23_.HTM |