HI HR196 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 3 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-04-03 - Resolution adopted in final form.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 3 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-04-03 - Resolution adopted in final form.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Urging Congress And The United States Department Of Veterans Affairs To Include Within The Definition Of "atomic Veterans" The Veterans Involved In The Cleanup Of The United States Nuclear Test Site On Lojwa Island From 1977 To 1980 Making Them Eligible To Receive Compensation And Health Care Benefits From The United States Government.
Title
Congress; United States Department of Veterans Affairs; Lojwa; Radiation; Benefits
Sponsors
Rep. Mark Takai [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-04-03 | House | Resolution adopted in final form. |
2014-04-03 | House | Adopted with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Cachola, Carroll, Oshiro, Say excused (4). |
2014-04-03 | House | Reported from VMI (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1429-14), recommending adoption. |
2014-04-02 | House | The committees on VMI recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 6 Ayes: Representative(s) Takai, Ito, Awana, Cachola, Onishi, Tsuji; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 5 Excused: Representative(s) Brower, Choy, Ohno, McDermott, Wooley. |
2014-03-27 | House | Resolution scheduled to be heard by VMI on Wednesday, 04-02-14 8:30AM in conference room 312. |
2014-03-19 | House | Re-referred to VMI, referral sheet 37 |
2014-03-13 | House | Referred to VMI, FIN, referral sheet 34 |
2014-03-07 | House | Offered |
Same As/Similar To
HCR247 (Same As) 2014-04-08 - Referred to PSM/WAM.
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=HR&billnumber=196&year=2014 |
Text | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2014/bills/HR196_.HTM |