HI HR192 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-0)
Status: Passed on April 4 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-04-04 - Resolution adopted in final form.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-0)
Status: Passed on April 4 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-04-04 - Resolution adopted in final form.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Urging The Department Of Health To Investigate And Implement Policies To Reduce The Importation Of Ingestible Food And Beverage Products, Packaging, Or Materials Containing Perfluoroalkyl And Polyfluoroalkyl Substances Into The State.
Title
Urging The Department Of Health To Investigate And Implement Policies To Reduce The Importation Of Ingestible Food And Beverage Products, Packaging, Or Materials Containing Perfluoroalkyl And Polyfluoroalkyl Substances Into The State.
Sponsors
Rep. Nicole Lowen [D] | Rep. Trish La Chica [D] | Rep. Lisa Marten [D] | Rep. Amy Perruso [D] |
Rep. Mahina Poepoe [D] | Rep. Sean Quinlan [D] | Rep. Chris Todd [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-04 | House | Resolution adopted in final form. |
2024-04-04 | House | Adopted as amended in HD 1 with none voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) Garcia voting no (1) and Representative(s) Kitagawa, Quinlan, Souza excused (3). |
2024-04-04 | House | Reported from CPC (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1731-24) as amended in HD 1, recommending adoption. |
2024-04-02 | House | The committee on CPC recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 7 Ayes: Representative(s) Nakashima, Sayama, Belatti, Lowen, Tam, Pierick; Ayes with reservations: Representative(s) Onishi; Noes: none; and 4 Excused: Representative(s) Amato, Hashem, Hussey-Burdick, Gates. |
2024-03-28 | House | Resolution scheduled to be heard by CPC on Tuesday, 04-02-24 2:00PM in conference room 329 VIA VIDEOCONFERENCE. |
2024-03-22 | House | Report adopted; referred to the committee(s) on CPC with none voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) Garcia voting no (1) and Representative(s) Evslin, Garrett, Kila, Lamosao, Martinez, Nakashima, Quinlan excused (7). |
2024-03-22 | House | Reported from EEP (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1346-24), recommending referral to CPC. |
2024-03-21 | House | The committee on EEP recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 4 Ayes: Representative(s) Lowen, Cochran, Perruso, Woodson; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 3 Excused: Representative(s) Gates, Kahaloa, Ward. |
2024-03-15 | House | Resolution scheduled to be heard by EEP on Thursday, 03-21-24 9:31AM in conference room 325 VIA VIDEOCONFERENCE. |
2024-03-14 | House | Referred to EEP, CPC, referral sheet 22 |
2024-03-08 | House | Offered |
Same As/Similar To
HCR212 (Same As) 2024-04-05 - Referred to HHS/AEN.