HI HR186 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Passed on April 3 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-04-03 - Resolution adopted in final form.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Passed on April 3 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-04-03 - Resolution adopted in final form.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Requesting The Department Of Health To Conduct A Study On The Long-standing Cultural Hawaiian Practice Of Sun-drying Fish To Determine What Can Be Done To Preserve This Cultural Practice While Protecting The Public Health.
Title
Fish-Drying; Public Health; Study
Sponsors
Rep. Richard Creagan [D] | Rep. Faye Hanohano [D] | Rep. Bertrand Kobayashi [D] | Rep. Mark Nakashima [D] |
Rep. Clift Tsuji [D] | Rep. Cindy Evans [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-04-03 | House | Resolution adopted in final form. |
2014-04-03 | House | Adopted with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Cachola, Carroll, Oshiro, Say excused (4). |
2014-04-03 | House | Reported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1455-14), recommending adoption. |
2014-04-02 | House | The committees on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 15 Ayes: Representative(s) Luke, Nishimoto, Johanson, Cullen, Ing, Jordan, Kobayashi, Lowen, Morikawa, Onishi, Takayama, Tokioka, Yamashita, Fukumoto, Ward; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) Hashem, Woodson. |
2014-04-01 | House | Broadcast of hearing/briefing available. See: www.capitoltv.org |
2014-03-31 | House | Resolution scheduled to be heard by FIN on Wednesday, 04-02-14 3:35PM in conference room 308. |
2014-03-24 | House | Report adopted; referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Evans, Kobayashi, Yamane excused (3). |
2014-03-24 | House | Reported from HLT (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1230-14), recommending referral to FIN. |
2014-03-21 | House | The committees on HLT recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 7 Ayes: Representative(s) Belatti, Morikawa, Creagan, Hashem, Kobayashi, Woodson, Matsumoto; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 3 Excused: Representative(s) Carroll, Jordan, Oshiro. |
2014-03-19 | House | Resolution scheduled to be heard by HLT on Friday, 03-21-14 9:00AM in conference room 329. |
2014-03-19 | House | Re-referred to HLT, FIN, referral sheet 37 |
2014-03-13 | House | Referred to HLT, OMH, FIN, referral sheet 34 |
2014-03-07 | House | Offered |
Same As/Similar To
HCR236 (Same As) 2014-04-08 - Referred to HTH/HWN, WAM.
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=HR&billnumber=186&year=2014 |
Text | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2014/bills/HR186_.HTM |