HI HR179 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on March 7 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-03-25 - Report adopted; referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Har, Yamane excused (2).
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 7 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-03-25 - Report adopted; referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Har, Yamane excused (2).
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Requesting A Financial Report From The Aha Moku Advisory Committee.
Title
Aha Moku Advisory Committee
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-03-25 | House | Report adopted; referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Har, Yamane excused (2). |
2014-03-25 | House | Reported from WAL (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1324-14), recommending referral to FIN. |
2014-03-24 | House | The committees on WAL recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 7 Ayes: Representative(s) Lowen, Cullen, Hanohano, C. Lee, Nishimoto, Fale, Thielen; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 3 Excused: Representative(s) Evans, Kawakami, Say. |
2014-03-21 | House | Resolution scheduled to be heard by WAL on Monday, 03-24-14 10:30AM in House conference room 325. |
2014-03-13 | House | Referred to WAL, FIN, referral sheet 34 |
2014-03-07 | House | Offered |
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=HR&billnumber=179&year=2014 |
Text | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2014/bills/HR179_.HTM |