HI HR175 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on April 11 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-04-11 - Resolution adopted in final form.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on April 11 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-04-11 - Resolution adopted in final form.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Requesting The Department Of Health To Issue Certificates Of Birth, Marriage, Divorce, Or Death Containing Names In The Hawaiian Language As Accurately And Timely As Certificates Containing Names That Are Not In The Hawaiian Language.
Title
Department of Health; Hawaiian Language Names; Records
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-04-11 | House | Resolution adopted in final form. |
2013-04-11 | House | Adopted with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Har, Oshiro excused (2). |
2013-04-11 | House | Reported from JUD (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1627), recommending adoption. |
2013-04-05 | House | The committees on JUD recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 8 Ayes: Representative(s) Rhoads, Har, Belatti, Ito, C. Lee, Tsuji, Wooley, Thielen; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 5 Excused: Representative(s) Brower, Cabanilla, Carroll, Kawakami, McDermott. |
2013-04-02 | House | Resolution scheduled to be heard by JUD on Friday, 04-05-13 2:00PM in conference room 325. |
2013-04-02 | House | Report adopted; referred to the committee(s) on JUD with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Carroll excused (1). |
2013-04-02 | House | Reported from HLT/OMH (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1341), recommending referral to JUD. |
2013-03-27 | House | The committees on OMH recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 6 Ayes: Representative(s) Hanohano, Cullen, Coffman, Evans, C. Lee, Lowen; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) Kawakami, Fale. |
2013-03-27 | House | The committees on HLT recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 6 Ayes: Representative(s) Belatti, Morikawa, Jordan, Kobayashi, Woodson, Cheape; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) Cabanilla, Carroll. |
2013-03-25 | House | Resolution scheduled to be heard by HLT/OMH on Wednesday, 03-27-13 11:15AM in conference room 329. |
2013-03-19 | House | Referred to HLT/OMH, JUD, referral sheet 40 |
2013-03-13 | House | Offered |
Same As/Similar To
HCR221 (Same As) 2013-04-15 - Referred to HTH/THA.
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=HR&billnumber=175&year=2013 |
Text | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2013/Bills/HR175_.HTM |