HI HR165 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Passed on April 3 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-04-03 - Resolution adopted in final form.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Passed on April 3 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-04-03 - Resolution adopted in final form.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Requesting Facebook To Correct Inaccurate Place Names And Location Information Perpetuated And Widely-distributed On Facebook Pages To Better Protect The State's Social And Economic Interests.
Title
Facebook; Social Media; Kailua; Kailua-Kona
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-04-03 | House | Resolution adopted in final form. |
2014-04-03 | House | Adopted with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Cachola, Carroll, Oshiro, Say excused (4). |
2014-04-03 | House | Reported from VMI (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1421-14), recommending adoption. |
2014-04-02 | House | The committees on VMI recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 6 Ayes: Representative(s) Takai, Ito, Awana, Cachola, Onishi, Tsuji; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 5 Excused: Representative(s) Brower, Choy, Ohno, McDermott, Wooley. |
2014-03-27 | House | Resolution scheduled to be heard by VMI on Wednesday, 04-02-14 8:30AM in conference room 312. |
2014-03-19 | House | Re-referred to VMI, referral sheet 37 |
2014-03-12 | House | Referred to VMI, FIN, referral sheet 33 |
2014-03-07 | House | Offered |
Same As/Similar To
HCR210 (Same As) 2014-04-08 - Referred to TEC.
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=HR&billnumber=165&year=2014 |
Text | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2014/bills/HR165_.HTM |