HI HR164 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 13-0)
Status: Introduced on March 13 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-03-28 - The committee(s) on HUS recommend(s) that the measure be deferred.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 13 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-03-28 - The committee(s) on HUS recommend(s) that the measure be deferred.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Requesting The Convening Of A Task Force On Child Support Responsibility.
Title
Task Force on Child Support Responsibility
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-03-28 | House | The committee(s) on HUS recommend(s) that the measure be deferred. |
2013-03-25 | House | Resolution scheduled to be heard by HUS on Thursday, 03-28-13 10:00AM in conference room 329. |
2013-03-19 | House | Referred to HUS, JUD, FIN, referral sheet 40 |
2013-03-13 | House | Offered |
Same As/Similar To
HCR203 (Same As) 2013-03-28 - The committee(s) on HUS recommend(s) that the measure be deferred.
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=HR&billnumber=164&year=2013 |
Text | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2013/Bills/HR164_.HTM |