HI HR146 | 2020 | Regular Session

Note: Carryover of previous HR146

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-0)
Status: Introduced on March 6 2020 - 25% progression
Action: 2020-06-30 - Report adopted; referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Har, McDermott, Say excused (3).
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Recognizing The Unique Language And Contributions To Hawaiian Culture Of The Niihau Community.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Recognizing The Unique Language And Contributions To Hawaiian Culture Of The Niihau Community.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-06-29 - House - House Water, Land, & Hawaiian Affairs: Passed, Unamended (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-06-30HouseReport adopted; referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Har, McDermott, Say excused (3).
2020-06-30HouseReported from WLH (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1244-20), recommending referral to FIN.
2020-06-29HouseThe committees on WLH recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 4 Ayes: Representative(s) Yamane, Todd, Tarnas, Wildberger; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 3 Excused: Representative(s) Har, Lowen, Ward.
2020-06-25HouseResolution scheduled to be heard by WLH on Monday, 06-29-20 11:00AM in conference room 325.
2020-03-16HouseThis measure has been deleted from the meeting scheduled on Wednesday 03-18-20 10:00AM in conference room 325.
2020-03-13HouseResolution scheduled to be heard by WLH on Wednesday, 03-18-20 10:00AM in conference room 325.
2020-03-11HouseReferred to WLH, FIN, referral sheet 40
2020-03-06HouseOffered

Same As/Similar To

HCR167 (Same As) 2020-06-30 - Report adopted; referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Har, McDermott, Say excused (3).
HR146 (Carry Over) 2019-03-14 - Referred to WLH, FIN, referral sheet 33

Subjects


Hawaii State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback