HI HR138 | 2021 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future HR138
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-0)
Status: Passed on March 31 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-03-31 - Resolution adopted in final form.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-0)
Status: Passed on March 31 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-03-31 - Resolution adopted in final form.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Requesting The Department Of Human Services; Department Of Health, Via The Behavioral Risk Factor Surveillance System; And Department Of Education, Via The Youth Risk Behavior Surveillance System, To Collect Information On The Sex, Sexual Orientation, And Gender Identity And Gender Expression Of Respondents, Including Respondents Who Are Under The Supervision Of The Courts And The Hawaii Youth Correctional Facility.
Title
Requesting The Department Of Human Services; Department Of Health, Via The Behavioral Risk Factor Surveillance System; And Department Of Education, Via The Youth Risk Behavior Surveillance System, To Collect Information On The Sex, Sexual Orientation, And Gender Identity And Gender Expression Of Respondents, Including Respondents Who Are Under The Supervision Of The Courts And The Hawaii Youth Correctional Facility.
Sponsors
Rep. Nadine Nakamura [D] | Rep. Cedric Gates [D] | Sen. Troy Hashimoto [D] | Rep. Jeanne Kapela [D] |
Rep. Lisa Marten [D] | Rep. Daynette Morikawa [D] | Rep. Tina Wildberger [D] | Rep. Jackson Sayama [D] |
Roll Calls
2021-03-30 - House - House Finance: Passed, Unamended (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-03-23 - House - House Health, Human Services, & Homelessness: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-03-23 - House - House Health, Human Services, & Homelessness: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-03-31 | House | Resolution adopted in final form. |
2021-03-31 | House | Adopted with none voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) McDermott voting no (1) and Representative(s) Gates, Ohno excused (2). |
2021-03-31 | House | Reported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1573), recommending adoption. |
2021-03-30 | House | The committees on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 13 Ayes: Representative(s) Luke, Cullen, Branco, Eli, Holt, Ilagan, B. Kobayashi, Marten, Nishimoto, Perruso, Sayama, Tam, Wildberger; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) Yamashita, McDermott. |
2021-03-29 | House | Re-scheduled for decision making on Tuesday, 03-30-21 11:00AM in conference room 308 Via Videoconference. |
2021-03-25 | House | Scheduled for decision making on Tuesday, 03-30-21 11:00AM in conference room 309 Via Videoconference. |
2021-03-24 | House | Report adopted. referred to the committee(s) on FIN as amended in HD 1 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and none excused (0). |
2021-03-24 | House | Reported from HHH (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1296) as amended in HD 1, recommending referral to FIN. |
2021-03-23 | House | The committees on HHH recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 7 Ayes: Representative(s) Yamane, Tam, Gates, Har, Kapela, Nishimoto, Ward; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) LoPresti. |
2021-03-18 | House | Resolution scheduled to be heard by HHH on Tuesday, 03-23-21 9:00AM in conference room 329 Via Videoconference. |
2021-03-15 | House | Referred to HHH, FIN, referral sheet 25 |
2021-03-12 | House | Offered |
Same As/Similar To
HR138 (Carry Over) 2021-03-31 - Resolution adopted in final form.
HCR162 (Same As) 2021-04-23 - Resolution adopted in final form.
HCR162 (Same As) 2021-04-23 - Resolution adopted in final form.
Subjects
Data Collection
Department of Education
Department of Health
Department of Human Services
Hawaii Youth Correctional Facility
Lesbian, Gay, Bisexual, Transgender, Queer or Questioning, and Intersex Children and Youth
Department of Education
Department of Health
Department of Human Services
Hawaii Youth Correctional Facility
Lesbian, Gay, Bisexual, Transgender, Queer or Questioning, and Intersex Children and Youth