HI HR124 | 2021 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future HR124
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Introduced on March 12 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-03-24 - Report adopted; referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and none excused (0).
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 12 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-03-24 - Report adopted; referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and none excused (0).
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Requesting The Department Of Health To Explore Ways It Can Exercise Oversight Over Community Health Centers And Other Medical Service Entities When A Danger To The Community's Health Exists.
Title
Requesting The Department Of Health To Explore Ways It Can Exercise Oversight Over Community Health Centers And Other Medical Service Entities When A Danger To The Community's Health Exists.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-03-23 - House - House Health, Human Services, & Homelessness: Passed, Unamended (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-03-24 | House | Report adopted; referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and none excused (0). |
2021-03-24 | House | Reported from HHH (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1286), recommending referral to FIN. |
2021-03-23 | House | The committees on HHH recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 7 Ayes: Representative(s) Yamane, Tam, Gates, Har, Kapela, Nishimoto, Ward; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) LoPresti. |
2021-03-18 | House | Resolution scheduled to be heard by HHH on Tuesday, 03-23-21 9:00AM in conference room 329 Via Videoconference. |
2021-03-15 | House | Referred to HHH, FIN , referral sheet 25 |
2021-03-12 | House | Offered |
Same As/Similar To
HR124 (Carry Over) 2021-03-24 - Report adopted; referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and none excused (0).
HCR148 (Same As) 2021-03-24 - Report adopted; referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and none excused (0).
HCR148 (Same As) 2021-03-24 - Report adopted; referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and none excused (0).