HI HR119 | 2018 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous HR119
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-0)
Status: Passed on March 28 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-28 - Resolution adopted in final form.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-0)
Status: Passed on March 28 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-28 - Resolution adopted in final form.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Urging The United States Congress To Support And Fund The Scientific Study Of Firearms Violence And Prevention.
Title
Urging The United States Congress To Support And Fund The Scientific Study Of Firearms Violence And Prevention.
Sponsors
Sen. Joy San Buenaventura [D] | Rep. Romy Cachola [D] | Sen. Angus McKelvey [D] | Rep. John Mizuno [D] |
Rep. Nadine Nakamura [D] | Rep. Takashi Ohno [D] | Rep. Chris Todd [D] | Rep. Daynette Morikawa [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-28 | House | Resolution adopted in final form. |
2018-03-28 | House | Adopted with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Souki excused (1). |
2018-03-28 | House | Reported from JUD (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1746-18), recommending adoption. |
2018-03-27 | House | The committees on JUD recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 6 Ayes: Representative(s) Nishimoto, San Buenaventura, C. Lee, Morikawa, Takayama, Thielen; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) Brower, McDermott. |
2018-03-23 | House | Resolution scheduled to be heard by JUD on Tuesday, 03-27-18 2:00PM in conference room 325. |
2018-03-13 | House | Referred to JUD, referral sheet 39 |
2018-03-09 | House | Offered |
Same As/Similar To
HCR133 (Same As) 2018-03-29 - Referred to PSM/JDC.
HR119 (Carry Over) 2017-03-14 - Referred to HLT, FIN, referral sheet 30
HR119 (Carry Over) 2017-03-14 - Referred to HLT, FIN, referral sheet 30
Subjects
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=HR&billnumber=119&year=2018 |
Text | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2018/bills/HR119_.HTM |