HI HR112 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-0)
Status: Introduced on March 13 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-03-24 - Report adopted; referred to the committee(s) on HED with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Har, Ing, Takumi excused (3).
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 13 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-03-24 - Report adopted; referred to the committee(s) on HED with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Har, Ing, Takumi excused (3).
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Requesting That The University Of Hawaii At Manoa College Of Tropical Agriculture And Human Resources Convene A Working Group To Develop A Coordinated Framework Of Support For Preschool Through Post-secondary Agriculture Education.
Title
Agriculture Education; P-20 Education
Sponsors
Rep. Clift Tsuji [D] | Rep. Lynn Decoite [D] | Rep. Ken Ito [D] | Rep. Sam Kong [D] |
Rep. Richard Onishi [D] | Rep. Kyle Yamashita [D] | Rep. Roy Takumi [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-03-24 | House | Report adopted; referred to the committee(s) on HED with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Har, Ing, Takumi excused (3). |
2015-03-24 | House | Reported from AGR (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1040), recommending referral to HED. |
2015-03-20 | House | The committees on AGR recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 10 Ayes: Representative(s) Tsuji, Onishi, Brower, Cachola, DeCoite, Kawakami, Kong, Ohno, Tokioka, Matsumoto; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 4 Excused: Representative(s) Choy, Ito, Woodson, Ward. |
2015-03-18 | House | Resolution scheduled to be heard by AGR on Friday, 03-20-15 9:30AM in conference room 312. |
2015-03-16 | House | Referred to AGR, HED, FIN, referral sheet 33 |
2015-03-13 | House | Offered |
Same As/Similar To
HCR176 (Same As) 2015-03-24 - Report adopted; referred to the committee(s) on HED with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Har, Ing, Takumi excused (3).
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=HR&billnumber=112&year=2015 |
Text | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2015/bills/HR112_.HTM |