HI HR105 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 9 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-04-09 - Resolution adopted in final form.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 9 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-04-09 - Resolution adopted in final form.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Expressing Support Of Further Discussion On The Possibility Of Local Ownership And Control Of Electric Utilities And Encouragement Of Robust Discussions That Include The Exploration Of Alternative Ownership Models For Electric Utilities.
Title
PUC; Energy
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-04-09 | House | Resolution adopted in final form. |
2015-04-09 | House | Adopted with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Tokioka excused (1). |
2015-04-09 | House | Reported from CPC (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1395), recommending adoption. |
2015-04-06 | House | The committees on CPC recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 10 Ayes: Representative(s) McKelvey, Woodson, Brower, Creagan, C. Lee, Nakashima, Oshiro, San Buenaventura, Fukumoto Chang, McDermott; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 6 Excused: Representative(s) Belatti, Har, Hashem, Kawakami, Takayama, Yamane. |
2015-04-01 | House | Resolution scheduled to be heard by CPC on Monday, 04-06-15 2:30PM in conference room 325. |
2015-03-31 | House | Report adopted. referred to the committee(s) on CPC as amended in HD 1 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Oshiro, Tokioka excused (2). |
2015-03-31 | House | Reported from EEP (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1317) as amended in HD 1, recommending referral to CPC. |
2015-03-24 | House | The committees on EEP recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 8 Ayes: Representative(s) C. Lee, Lowen, Cullen, Evans, Nishimoto, Say, Pouha, Thielen; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) Ing, Yamane. |
2015-03-20 | House | Scheduled for decision making on Tuesday, 03-24-15 11:30AM in conference room 325. |
2015-03-20 | House | Re-referred to EEP, CPC, referral sheet 35 |
2015-03-19 | House | The committee(s) on EEP recommend(s) that the measure be deferred until 03-24-15. |
2015-03-16 | House | Resolution scheduled to be heard by EEP on Thursday, 03-19-15 8:30AM in conference room 325. |
2015-03-16 | House | Referred to EEP, CPC, FIN, referral sheet 33 |
2015-03-13 | House | Offered |
Same As/Similar To
HCR169 (Same As) 2015-04-10 - Referred to CPN.