HI HCR99 | 2022 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous HCR99
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 7 2022 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-04-12 - Referred to AEN/HTH.
Pending: Senate Agriculture and Environment Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on April 7 2022 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-04-12 - Referred to AEN/HTH.
Pending: Senate Agriculture and Environment Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Urging The Honolulu City Council To Review Its Ordinance On Chickens, Investigate The Ordinance's Role In Contributing To The Growing Population Of Feral Chickens, And Take Action To Reduce The Growing Problem Of Feral Chickens.
Title
Urging The Honolulu City Council To Review Its Ordinance On Chickens, Investigate The Ordinance's Role In Contributing To The Growing Population Of Feral Chickens, And Take Action To Reduce The Growing Problem Of Feral Chickens.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-04-05 - House - House Judiciary & Hawaiian Affairs: Passed, Unamended (Y: 8 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-03-23 - House - House Agriculture: Passed, Unamended (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-23 - House - House Agriculture: Passed, Unamended (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-04-12 | Senate | Referred to AEN/HTH. |
2022-04-08 | Senate | Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 433). |
2022-04-07 | House | Transmitted to Senate. |
2022-04-07 | House | Adopted with none voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) McKelvey voting no (1) and Representative(s) Costales, D. Kobayashi, Nishimoto excused (3). |
2022-04-07 | House | Reported from JHA (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1709-22), recommending adoption. |
2022-04-05 | House | The committees on JHA recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 8 Ayes: Representative(s) Nakashima, Matayoshi, Ichiyama, LoPresti, Lowen, Nakamura, Takumi, Ward; Ayes with reservations: none; 2 Noes: Representative(s) McKelvey, Tokioka; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) D. Kobayashi. |
2022-04-01 | House | Resolution scheduled to be heard by JHA on Tuesday, 04-05-22 2:00PM in conference room 325 Via Videoconference. |
2022-03-31 | House | Report adopted; referred to the committee(s) on JHA with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Eli, Hashem, D. Kobayashi, Ohno excused (4). |
2022-03-31 | House | Reported from AGR (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1636-22), recommending referral to JHA. |
2022-03-23 | House | The committees on AGR recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 8 Ayes: Representative(s) Hashem, Perruso, Lowen, Marten, Matayoshi, Todd, Tokioka, Matsumoto; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 0 Excused: none. |
2022-03-21 | House | Resolution scheduled to be heard by AGR on Wednesday, 03-23-22 9:00AM in conference room 325 Via Videoconference. |
2022-03-14 | House | Referred to AGR, JHA, referral sheet 27 |
2022-03-11 | House | Offered |
Same As/Similar To
HR94 (Same As) 2022-04-07 - Resolution adopted in final form.
HCR99 (Carry Over) 2021-03-23 - The committee(s) on EEP recommend(s) that the measure be deferred.
HCR99 (Carry Over) 2021-03-23 - The committee(s) on EEP recommend(s) that the measure be deferred.