HI HCR92 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on April 19 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-04-19 - Resolution adopted in final form.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on April 19 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-04-19 - Resolution adopted in final form.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Recognizing The Issue Of Illegal Dumping Within The Waipahu Community And Urging The State, City And County Of Honolulu, And Military To Work Together To Address This Concern.
Title
Recognizing The Issue Of Illegal Dumping Within The Waipahu Community And Urging The State, City And County Of Honolulu, And Military To Work Together To Address This Concern.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-04-12 - Senate - Senate Agriculture and Environment: Passed, Unamended (Y: 3 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2024-04-12 - Senate - Senate Public Safety, Intergovernmental and Military Affairs: Passed, Unamended (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-04-12 - Senate - Senate Public Safety, Intergovernmental and Military Affairs: Passed, Unamended (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-19 | House | Resolution adopted in final form. |
2024-04-19 | House | Returned from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 713). |
2024-04-19 | Senate | Report and Resolution Adopted. Transmitted to House. |
2024-04-18 | Senate | One Day Notice 04-19-24. |
2024-04-18 | Senate | Reported from AEN/PSM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 3866) with recommendation of adoption. |
2024-04-12 | Senate | The committee(s) on PSM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in PSM were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Wakai, Elefante, Fukunaga, Rhoads; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Awa. |
2024-04-12 | Senate | The committee(s) on AEN recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in AEN were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) Gabbard, DeCoite, Rhoads; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Richards, Awa. |
2024-04-09 | Senate | The committee(s) on AEN/PSM has scheduled a public hearing on 04-12-24 1:00PM; CR 224 & Videoconference. |
2024-04-03 | Senate | Referred to AEN/PSM. |
2024-04-02 | Senate | Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 488). |
2024-04-01 | House | Transmitted to Senate. |
2024-04-01 | House | Adopted as amended in HD 1 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Gates, Quinlan excused (2). |
2024-04-01 | House | Reported from WAL (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1562-24) as amended in HD 1, recommending adoption. |
2024-03-19 | House | The committee on WAL recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 9 Ayes: Representative(s) Ichiyama, Poepoe, Chun, Ganaden, Hashem, M. Mizuno, Morikawa, Takayama, Souza; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and Excused: none. |
2024-03-15 | House | Resolution scheduled to be heard by WAL on Tuesday, 03-19-24 9:30AM in conference room 430 VIA VIDEOCONFERENCE. |
2024-03-13 | House | Referred to WAL, referral sheet 21 |
2024-03-08 | House | Offered |
2024-03-07 | House | To be offered. |
Same As/Similar To
HR76 (Same As) 2024-04-01 - Resolution adopted in final form.