HI HCR89 | 2019 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future HCR89
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-1)
Status: Passed on April 22 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-22 - Resolution adopted in final form.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-1)
Status: Passed on April 22 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-22 - Resolution adopted in final form.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Requesting The United States Congress To Enact Legislation Removing Cannabis From The Federal Controlled Substances Act And Facilitate The Full Spectrum Of Private Banking Services For Cannabis-related Business.
Title
Requesting The United States Congress To Enact Legislation Removing Cannabis From The Federal Controlled Substances Act And Facilitate The Full Spectrum Of Private Banking Services For Cannabis-related Business.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-22 | House | Resolution adopted in final form. |
2019-04-22 | House | Returned from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 926). |
2019-04-22 | Senate | Report and Resolution Adopted with Senator Fevella voting "No". Transmitted to House. |
2019-04-18 | Senate | One Day Notice 04-22-19. |
2019-04-18 | Senate | Reported from PSM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2191) with recommendation of adoption. |
2019-04-16 | Senate | The committee(s) on PSM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in PSM were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) Nishihara, Wakai, Baker; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 1 No(es): Senator(s) Fevella; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Harimoto. |
2019-04-12 | Senate | The committee(s) on PSM has scheduled a public hearing on 04-16-19 1:35PM in conference room 016. |
2019-04-02 | Senate | Referred to PSM. |
2019-04-02 | Senate | Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 520). |
2019-04-01 | House | Transmitted to Senate. |
2019-04-01 | House | Adopted with Representative(s) Kitagawa voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) Cachola, DeCoite, Eli, Har, Kong, Matayoshi, Matsumoto, Okimoto, Say, Tokioka, Ward voting no (11) and Representative(s) Holt, McKelvey, Quinlan, Saiki, Todd excused (5). |
2019-04-01 | House | Reported from JUD (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1926), recommending adoption. |
2019-03-22 | House | The committees on JUD recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 8 Ayes: Representative(s) C. Lee, San Buenaventura, Brower, Lowen, McKelvey, Morikawa, Takayama, Thielen; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 3 Excused: Representative(s) Creagan, Say, Yamane. |
2019-03-20 | House | Resolution scheduled to be heard by JUD on Friday, 03-22-19 2:10PM in conference room 325. |
2019-03-14 | House | Referred to JUD, referral sheet 33 |
2019-03-08 | House | Offered |
Same As/Similar To
HCR89 (Carry Over) 2019-04-22 - Resolution adopted in final form.
HR86 (Same As) 2019-04-01 - Resolution adopted in final form.
HR86 (Same As) 2019-04-01 - Resolution adopted in final form.
Subjects
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=HCR&billnumber=89&year=2019 |
Text | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2019/bills/HCR89_.HTM |