HI HCR82 | 2018 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous HCR82
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 4 2018 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-04-10 - Referred to LBR/CPH.
Pending: Senate Labor Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on April 4 2018 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-04-10 - Referred to LBR/CPH.
Pending: Senate Labor Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Requesting The Legislative Reference Bureau To Conduct A Study Of Best Practices Regarding "incidental And Supplemental" Contracting Work.
Title
Requesting The Legislative Reference Bureau To Conduct A Study Of Best Practices Regarding "incidental And Supplemental" Contracting Work.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-04-10 | Senate | Referred to LBR/CPH. |
2018-04-05 | Senate | Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 427). |
2018-04-04 | House | Transmitted to Senate. |
2018-04-04 | House | Adopted with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Choy, Fukumoto, Holt, C. Lee, McKelvey excused (5). |
2018-04-04 | House | Reported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1783-18), recommending adoption. |
2018-04-03 | House | The committees on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 12 Ayes: Representative(s) Luke, Cullen, Cachola, DeCoite, Gates, Holt, Keohokalole, Kobayashi, Lowen, Nakamura, Todd, Yamashita; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 3 Excused: Representative(s) Fukumoto, Tupola, Ward. |
2018-03-29 | House | Scheduled for decision making on Tuesday, 04-03-18 10:05AM in conference room 308. |
2018-03-28 | House | Report adopted. referred to the committee(s) on FIN as amended in HD 1 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Souki excused (1). |
2018-03-28 | House | Reported from LAB/LMG (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1675-18) as amended in HD 1, recommending referral to FIN. |
2018-03-21 | House | The committees on LMG recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 4 Ayes: Representative(s) Kobayashi, Nakashima, Belatti, Morikawa; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) Choy, Tupola. |
2018-03-21 | House | The committees on LAB recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 6 Ayes: Representative(s) Johanson, Holt, Evans, Keohokalole, Yamashita, Matsumoto; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Ichiyama. |
2018-03-19 | House | Resolution scheduled to be heard by LAB/LMG on Wednesday, 03-21-18 3:15PM in conference room 423. |
2018-03-13 | House | Referred to LAB/LMG, FIN, referral sheet 39 |
2018-03-08 | House | Offered |
2018-03-07 | House | To be offered. |
Same As/Similar To
HR67 (Same As) 2018-03-28 - Report adopted. referred to the committee(s) on FIN as amended in HD 1 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Souki excused (1).
HCR82 (Carry Over) 2017-03-29 - Report adopted; referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Aquino, Oshiro, Say, Thielen excused (4).
HCR82 (Carry Over) 2017-03-29 - Report adopted; referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Aquino, Oshiro, Say, Thielen excused (4).