HI HCR82 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 15 2011 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2011-04-19 - (S) Referred to CPN/EDT.
Pending: Senate Commerce and Consumer Protection Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on April 15 2011 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2011-04-19 - (S) Referred to CPN/EDT.
Pending: Senate Commerce and Consumer Protection Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Strongly Urging The Pest Control Board To Develop Standards For Pest Control Operators And Termite Inspection Reports, And To Adopt Those Standards Prior To The Convening Of The 2013 Regular Session Of The Hawaii Legislature.
Title
Pest Control
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-04-19 | (S) Referred to CPN/EDT. | |
2011-04-18 | (S) Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 596). | |
2011-04-15 | (H) Transmitted to Senate. | |
2011-04-15 | (H) Adopted with none voting no and Chong, Herkes, Kawakami, McKelvey, Thielen, Tokioka excused. | |
2011-04-15 | (H) Reported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1638), recommending adoption. | |
2011-04-13 | (H) The committees on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 12 Ayes: Representative(s) M. Oshiro, M. Lee, Choy, Cullen, Hashem, Ichiyama, Jordan, Kawakami, C. Lee, Morikawa, Tokioka, Yamashita; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 5 Excused: Representative(s) Chong, Har, Marumoto, Riviere, Ward. | |
2011-04-11 | (H) Scheduled for decision making on Wednesday, 04-13-11 10:30AM in conference room 308. | |
2011-04-05 | (H) Report adopted; referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting no and Carroll excused. | |
2011-04-05 | (H) Reported from CPC (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1364), recommending referral to FIN. | |
2011-03-28 | (H) The committees on CPC recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 12 Ayes: Representative(s) Herkes, Yamane, Brower, Ito, Keith-Agaran, Luke, McKelvey, B. Oshiro, Souki, Tsuji, Marumoto, Thielen; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 3 Excused: Representative(s) Cabanilla, Carroll, Ching. | |
2011-03-23 | (H) Resolution scheduled to be heard by CPC on Monday, 03-28-11 2:00PM in conference room 325. | |
2011-03-04 | (H) Referred to CPC, FIN, referral sheet 31 | |
2011-03-04 | (H) Offered | |
2011-03-03 | (H) To be offered. |
Same As/Similar To
HR76 (Same As) 2011-04-15 - (H) Resolution adopted in final form.
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2011/lists/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=HCR&billnumber=82 |
Text | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2011/Bills/HCR82_.HTM |