HI HCR78 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-0)
Status: Passed on April 27 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-05-01 - Received notice of Adoption in House (Hse. Com. No. 650).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-0)
Status: Passed on April 27 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-05-01 - Received notice of Adoption in House (Hse. Com. No. 650).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Requesting The Governor And Department Of Transportation To Include In The 2017-2018 Supplemental Capital Improvement Program Request Improvements To Cruise Ship Passenger Terminals At Nawiliwili Harbor In Kauai, Honolulu Harbor In Oahu, Kahului Harbor In Maui, And Hilo Harbor In Hawaii.
Title
Department of Transportation; Capital Improvements; Cruise Ship Passenger Terminals
Sponsors
Rep. Clift Tsuji [D] | Sen. Henry Aquino [D] | Rep. Tom Brower [D] | Rep. Mark Nakashima [D] |
Rep. Richard Onishi [D] | Rep. James Tokioka [D] | Rep. Justin Woodson [D] | Rep. Kyle Yamashita [D] |
Rep. Lynn Decoite [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-05-01 | Senate | Received notice of Adoption in House (Hse. Com. No. 650). |
2015-04-30 | House | Resolution adopted in final form. |
2015-04-30 | House | Adopted as amended in SD 1 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Matsumoto, McDermott, Say, Thielen, Yamane excused (5). |
2015-04-30 | House | House agrees to Senate amendment(s). |
2015-04-27 | House | Returned from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 676) in amended form (SD 1). |
2015-04-27 | Senate | Report and Resolution Adopted. Transmitted to House. |
2015-04-27 | Senate | Reported from WAM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1695) with recommendation of adoption. |
2015-04-23 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in WAM were as follows: 8 Aye(s): Senator(s) Tokuda, Chun Oakland, English, Harimoto, Inouye, Riviere, Ruderman, Slom; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 3 Excused: Senator(s) Kouchi, Dela Cruz, Galuteria. |
2015-04-22 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM will hold a public decision making on 04-23-15 9:10AM in conference room 211. |
2015-04-21 | Senate | Report adopted, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM. |
2015-04-21 | Senate | Reported from TRA (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1614), as amended (SD 1), with recommendation of referral to WAM. |
2015-04-16 | Senate | The committee(s) on TRA recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in TRA were as follows: 7 Aye(s): Senator(s) Nishihara, Harimoto, Dela Cruz, Inouye, Kidani, Kouchi, Slom; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) English, Espero. |
2015-04-13 | Senate | The committee(s) on TRA has scheduled a public hearing on 04-16-15 2:45PM in conference room 229. |
2015-04-10 | Senate | Referred to TRA, WAM. |
2015-04-09 | Senate | Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 385). |
2015-04-09 | House | Transmitted to Senate. |
2015-04-09 | House | Adopted with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Tokioka excused (1). |
2015-04-09 | House | Reported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1426), recommending adoption. |
2015-04-07 | House | The committees on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 15 Ayes: Representative(s) Luke, Nishimoto, Cachola, Cullen, DeCoite, Johanson, Jordan, Keohokalole, Kobayashi, Lowen, Onishi, Tokioka, Yamashita, Pouha, Ward; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and Excused: none. |
2015-04-02 | House | Resolution scheduled to be heard by FIN on Tuesday, 04-07-15 2:00PM in conference room 308. |
2015-03-25 | House | Re-referred to FIN, referral sheet 39 |
2015-03-16 | House | Referred to TRN, FIN, referral sheet 33 |
2015-03-10 | House | Offered |
2015-03-09 | House | To be offered. |