HI HCR74 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on March 1 2012 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-03-27 - (H) The committee(s) on EDN recommend(s) that the measure be deferred.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 1 2012 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-03-27 - (H) The committee(s) on EDN recommend(s) that the measure be deferred.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Requesting The Board Of Education To Work Cooperatively With The Hawaii State Public Library System To Transfer The Pahala Public And School Library To The Department Of Education To Be Operated As A School Library For Kau High School And To Allow Continued Public Access To The Library.
Title
Requesting the DOE and Hawaii public library system to work cooperatively for Pahala public library
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-03-27 | (H) The committee(s) on EDN recommend(s) that the measure be deferred. | |
2012-03-23 | (H) Scheduled for decision making on Tuesday, 03-27-12 2:00PM in conference room 309. | |
2012-03-21 | (H) The committee(s) on EDN recommend(s) that the measure be deferred until 03-27-12 at 2:00 PM. | |
2012-03-16 | (H) Resolution scheduled to be heard by EDN on Wednesday, 03-21-12 2:00PM in conference room 309. | |
2012-03-06 | (H) Referred to EDN, FIN, referral sheet 40 | |
2012-03-02 | (H) Offered | |
2012-03-01 | (H) To be offered. |
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=HCR&billnumber=74 |
Text | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2012/Bills/HCR74_.HTM |