HI HCR7 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-03-27 - Report adopted; referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Creagan, DeCoite, Holt, McKelvey excused (4).
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Approving The Transfer Of The Leased Fee Interest In A Portion Of 610 Cooke Street, Honolulu, Hawaii, To The City And County Of Honolulu.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Approving The Transfer Of The Leased Fee Interest In A Portion Of 610 Cooke Street, Honolulu, Hawaii, To The City And County Of Honolulu.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-03-27HouseReport adopted; referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Creagan, DeCoite, Holt, McKelvey excused (4).
2019-03-27HouseReported from WLH (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1774), recommending referral to FIN.
2019-03-15HouseThe committees on WLH recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 7 Ayes: Representative(s) Yamane, Todd, Har, Lowen, Tarnas, Wildberger, Thielen; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and Excused: none.
2019-03-12HouseResolution scheduled to be heard by WLH on Friday, 03-15-19 9:30AM in conference room 325.
2019-02-11HouseReferred to WLH, FIN, referral sheet 20
2019-01-24HouseOffered
2019-01-22HouseTo be offered.

Subjects


Hawaii State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback