HI HCR7 | 2018 | Regular Session

Note: Carryover of previous HCR7

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 22 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-03-15 - Report adopted; referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Fukumoto, Har, Hashem, Lowen, McDermott, Nakashima, Souki excused (7).
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Approving The Sale Of The Leased Fee Interest In 2949 Ala Ilima Street, No. 204, Honolulu, Hawaii.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Approving The Sale Of The Leased Fee Interest In 2949 Ala Ilima Street, No. 204, Honolulu, Hawaii.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2018-03-15HouseReport adopted; referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Fukumoto, Har, Hashem, Lowen, McDermott, Nakashima, Souki excused (7).
2018-03-15HouseReported from HSG (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1152-18), recommending referral to FIN.
2018-02-13HouseThe committees on HSG recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 4 Ayes: Representative(s) Brower, Nakamura, Hashem, Quinlan; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 3 Excused: Representative(s) Aquino, San Buenaventura, McDermott.
2018-02-09HouseResolution scheduled to be heard by HSG on Tuesday, 02-13-18 10:15AM in conference room 423.
2018-02-08HouseReferred to HSG, FIN, referral sheet 18
2018-01-24HouseOffered
2018-01-22HouseTo be offered.

Same As/Similar To

SCR14 (Same As) 2018-04-24 - Resolution adopted in final form.
HCR7 (Carry Over) 2017-04-19 - Report adopted, referred to WAM.

Hawaii State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback