HI HCR7 | 2017 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 15-2)
Status: Engrossed on April 5 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-04-19 - Report adopted, referred to WAM.
Pending: Senate Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Urging The Department Of Human Services To Examine The Application Process For The Preschool Open Doors Program To Ensure Accessibility For All Who Qualify.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Urging The Department Of Human Services To Examine The Application Process For The Preschool Open Doors Program To Ensure Accessibility For All Who Qualify.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2017-04-19SenateReport adopted, referred to WAM.
2017-04-19SenateReported from HMS (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1619), with recommendation of referral to WAM.
2017-04-17SenateThe committee(s) on HMS recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in HMS were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) Green, S. Chang, Harimoto; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Tokuda, Wakai.
2017-04-13SenateThe committee(s) on HMS has scheduled a public hearing on 04-17-17 10:20AM in conference room 229.
2017-04-07SenateReferred to HMS, WAM.
2017-04-06SenateReceived from House (Hse. Com. No. 402).
2017-04-05HouseTransmitted to Senate.
2017-04-05HouseAdopted with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and none excused (0).
2017-04-05HouseReported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1605), recommending adoption.
2017-04-04HouseThe committees on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 14 Ayes: Representative(s) Luke, Cullen, Cachola, Choy, DeCoite, Holt, Keohokalole, Kobayashi, LoPresti, Lowen, Nakamura, Tokioka, Yamashita, Tupola; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 3 Excused: Representative(s) Gates, Quinlan, Ward.
2017-03-31HouseScheduled for decision making on Tuesday, 04-04-17 10:35AM in conference room 308.
2017-03-22HouseReport adopted. referred to the committee(s) on FIN as amended in HD 1 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Ichiyama, C. Lee, Lowen excused (3).
2017-03-22HouseReported from HUS (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1218) as amended in HD 1, recommending referral to FIN.
2017-03-15HouseThe committees on HUS recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 5 Ayes: Representative(s) Morikawa, Todd, Har, Kobayashi, Oshiro; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) Belatti, Tupola.
2017-03-08HouseResolution scheduled to be heard by HUS on Wednesday, 03-15-17 9:30AM in conference room 329.
2017-03-08HouseThis measure has been deleted from the meeting scheduled on Friday 03-10-17 9:30AM in conference room 329.
2017-03-07HouseResolution scheduled to be heard by HUS on Friday, 03-10-17 9:30AM in House conference room 329.
2017-02-07HouseReferred to HUS, FIN, referral sheet 14
2017-01-23HouseOffered
2017-01-20HouseTo be offered.

Same As/Similar To

SCR12 (Same As) 2017-02-06 - The committee on HMS deferred the measure.

Subjects


Hawaii State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback