HI HCR68 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-1)
Status: Passed on April 24 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-04-24 - Resolution adopted in final form.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-1)
Status: Passed on April 24 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-04-24 - Resolution adopted in final form.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Requesting The Division Of Aquatic Resources And Division Of Conservation And Resources Enforcement To Collaborate With Federal Partner Agencies To Protect Important State Marine Resources.
Title
DLNR; Marine Conservation; Spinner Dolphins; Sea Mammals; Sea Turtles
Sponsors
Sen. Angus McKelvey [D] | Rep. Tom Brower [D] | Rep. Richard Creagan [D] | Rep. Kaniela Ing [D] |
Rep. Nicole Lowen [D] | Rep. Takashi Ohno [D] | Rep. Cynthia Thielen [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-04-24 | House | Resolution adopted in final form. |
2015-04-24 | House | Returned from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 662). |
2015-04-24 | Senate | Report and Resolution Adopted. Transmitted to House. |
2015-04-23 | Senate | One Day Notice 04-24-15. |
2015-04-23 | Senate | Reported from WTL (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1672) with recommendation of adoption. |
2015-04-20 | Senate | The committee(s) on WTL recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in WTL were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) L. Thielen, Riviere, Ruderman, Shimabukuro, Slom; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Galuteria, Ihara. |
2015-04-16 | Senate | The committee(s) on WTL has scheduled a public hearing on 04-20-15 2:55PM in conference room 224. |
2015-04-10 | Senate | Referred to WTL. |
2015-04-09 | Senate | Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 382). |
2015-04-09 | House | Transmitted to Senate. |
2015-04-09 | House | Adopted with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Tokioka excused (1). |
2015-04-09 | House | Reported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1474), recommending adoption. |
2015-04-07 | House | The committees on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 15 Ayes: Representative(s) Luke, Nishimoto, Cachola, Cullen, DeCoite, Johanson, Jordan, Keohokalole, Kobayashi, Lowen, Onishi, Tokioka, Yamashita, Pouha, Ward; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and Excused: none. |
2015-04-02 | House | Scheduled for decision making on Tuesday, 04-07-15 2:15PM in conference room 308. |
2015-03-31 | House | Report adopted; referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Oshiro, Tokioka excused (2). |
2015-03-31 | House | Reported from OMH (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1276), recommending referral to FIN. |
2015-03-25 | House | The committees on OMH recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 9 Ayes: Representative(s) Lowen, Cullen, Evans, C. Lee, Nishimoto, Say, Yamane, Pouha, Thielen; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Ing. |
2015-03-20 | House | Resolution scheduled to be heard by OMH on Wednesday, 03-25-15 9:00AM in conference room 325. |
2015-03-10 | House | Referred to OMH, FIN, referral sheet 29 |
2015-03-06 | House | Offered |
2015-03-05 | House | To be offered. |
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=HCR&billnumber=68&year=2015 |
Text | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2015/bills/HCR68_.HTM |