HI HCR61 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 3 2014 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-04-08 - Referred to PSM/JDL.
Pending: Senate Public Safety, Intergovernmental and Military Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on April 3 2014 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-04-08 - Referred to PSM/JDL.
Pending: Senate Public Safety, Intergovernmental and Military Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Urging The United States Government To Restrict The Use Of Lethal Autonomous Robotics.
Title
Lethal Autonomous Robotics; War; Drones; Unmanned Combat Aerial Vehicles
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-04-08 | Senate | Referred to PSM/JDL. |
2014-04-04 | Senate | Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 445). |
2014-04-03 | House | Transmitted to Senate. |
2014-04-03 | House | Adopted as amended in HD 1 with Representative(s) Fale voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) McDermott, Ward voting no (2) and Representative(s) Cachola, Carroll, Oshiro, Say excused (4). |
2014-04-03 | House | Reported from VMI (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1433-14) as amended in HD 1, recommending adoption. |
2014-04-02 | House | The committees on VMI recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 6 Ayes: Representative(s) Takai, Ito, Awana, Cachola, Onishi, Tsuji; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 5 Excused: Representative(s) Brower, Choy, Ohno, McDermott, Wooley. |
2014-03-27 | House | Resolution scheduled to be heard by VMI on Wednesday, 04-02-14 8:30AM in conference room 312. |
2014-03-12 | House | The committee(s) on VMI recommend(s) that the measure be deferred. |
2014-03-11 | House | Broadcast of hearing/briefing available. See: www.capitoltv.org |
2014-03-07 | House | Resolution scheduled to be heard by VMI on Wednesday, 03-12-14 8:30AM in conference room 312. |
2014-02-28 | House | Referred to VMI, referral sheet 26 |
2014-02-27 | House | Offered |
2014-02-25 | House | To be offered. |