HI HCR55 | 2022 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous HCR55
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on March 9 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-03-31 - Report adopted; referred to the committee(s) on JHA with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Eli, Hashem, D. Kobayashi, Ohno excused (4).
Pending: House Judiciary & Hawaiian Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 9 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-03-31 - Report adopted; referred to the committee(s) on JHA with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Eli, Hashem, D. Kobayashi, Ohno excused (4).
Pending: House Judiciary & Hawaiian Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Requesting The Legislative Reference Bureau To Update A Study On The Feasibility Of Undergrounding The State's Utility Facilities.
Title
Requesting The Legislative Reference Bureau To Update A Study On The Feasibility Of Undergrounding The State's Utility Facilities.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-03-24 - House - House Energy & Environmental Protection: Passed, Unamended (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-31 | House | Report adopted; referred to the committee(s) on JHA with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Eli, Hashem, D. Kobayashi, Ohno excused (4). |
2022-03-31 | House | Reported from EEP (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1580-22), recommending referral to JHA. |
2022-03-24 | House | The committees on EEP recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 8 Ayes: Representative(s) Lowen, Marten, Hashem, Matayoshi, Perruso, Todd, Tokioka, Matsumoto; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and Excused: none. |
2022-03-17 | House | Resolution scheduled to be heard by EEP on Thursday, 03-24-22 10:00AM in conference room 325 Via Videoconference. |
2022-03-14 | House | Referred to EEP, JHA, referral sheet 27 |
2022-03-10 | House | Offered |
2022-03-09 | House | To be offered. |
Same As/Similar To
HCR55 (Carry Over) 2021-03-23 - Report adopted. referred to the committee(s) on FIN as amended in HD 1 with Representative(s) Okimoto voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) McDermott excused (1).
SCR99 (Same As) 2022-04-08 - Referred to EEP, JHA, referral sheet 47
SCR99 (Same As) 2022-04-08 - Referred to EEP, JHA, referral sheet 47