HI HCR49 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-1)
Status: Passed on May 3 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-05-03 - Resolution adopted in final form.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-1)
Status: Passed on May 3 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-05-03 - Resolution adopted in final form.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Requesting The City And County Of Honolulu To Conduct A Sidewalk Feasibility Study Along Kalihi Street From Kamanaiki Street To Kalihi Valley Park.
Title
Requesting The City And County Of Honolulu To Conduct A Sidewalk Feasibility Study Along Kalihi Street From Kamanaiki Street To Kalihi Valley Park.
Sponsors
Rep. May Mizuno [D] | Rep. Terez Amato [D] | Rep. Ernesto Ganaden [D] | Rep. Natalia Hussey-Burdick [D] |
Rep. Elijah Pierick [R] | Rep. Mahina Poepoe [D] | Rep. Gregg Takayama [D] | Rep. Adrian Tam [D] |
Roll Calls
2024-04-19 - Senate - Senate Government Operations: Passed, Unamended (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-04-19 - Senate - Senate Transportation and Culture and the Arts: Passed, Unamended (Y: 3 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2024-04-19 - Senate - Senate Transportation and Culture and the Arts: Passed, Unamended (Y: 3 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-05-03 | House | Resolution adopted in final form. |
2024-05-03 | House | Returned from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 799). |
2024-05-03 | Senate | Report and Resolution Adopted. Transmitted to House. |
2024-05-01 | Senate | One Day Notice 05-03-24. |
2024-05-01 | Senate | Reported from TCA/GVO (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 3963) with recommendation of adoption. |
2024-04-19 | Senate | The committee(s) on TCA recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in TCA were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) Lee, Elefante, Kanuha; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Inouye, Awa. |
2024-04-19 | Senate | The committee(s) on GVO recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in GVO were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) McKelvey, Gabbard, San Buenaventura, Wakai; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Awa. |
2024-04-16 | Senate | The committee(s) on TCA/GVO has scheduled a public hearing on 04-19-24 3:00PM; Conference Room 225 & Videoconference. |
2024-04-09 | Senate | Re-Referred to TCA/GVO. |
2024-04-03 | Senate | Referred to TCA/PSM. |
2024-04-01 | Senate | Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 477). |
2024-03-28 | House | Transmitted to Senate. |
2024-03-28 | House | Adopted with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Gates, Ichiyama, Kila, Lowen, Tam excused (5). |
2024-03-28 | House | Reported from TRN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1545-24), recommending adoption. |
2024-03-21 | House | The committee on TRN recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 7 Ayes: Representative(s) Todd, Kila, Aiu, Evslin, Kitagawa, Miyake, Onishi; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Matsumoto. |
2024-03-15 | House | Resolution scheduled to be heard by TRN on Thursday, 03-21-24 10:30AM in conference room 312 VIA VIDEOCONFERENCE. |
2024-03-08 | House | Referred to TRN, referral sheet 17 |
2024-03-07 | House | Offered |
2024-03-05 | House | To be offered. |
Same As/Similar To
HR38 (Same As) 2024-03-28 - Resolution adopted in final form.