HI HCR42 | 2017 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future HCR42
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 8 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-03-29 - Report adopted; referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Aquino, Oshiro, Say, Thielen excused (4).
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 8 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-03-29 - Report adopted; referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Aquino, Oshiro, Say, Thielen excused (4).
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Authorizing The Issuance Of A Term And Non-exclusive Easement Covering A Portion Of State Submerged Lands At Waikiki, Honolulu, Oahu, For The Maintenance And Repair Of The Existing Pier And Seawall And For Use, Repair, And Maintenance Of The Existing Improvements Constructed Thereon.
Title
Authorizing The Issuance Of A Term And Non-exclusive Easement Covering A Portion Of State Submerged Lands At Waikiki, Honolulu, Oahu, For The Maintenance And Repair Of The Existing Pier And Seawall And For Use, Repair, And Maintenance Of The Existing Improvements Constructed Thereon.
Sponsors
Rep. Mark Hashem [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-03-29 | House | Report adopted; referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Aquino, Oshiro, Say, Thielen excused (4). |
2017-03-29 | House | Reported from OMH/WAL (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1446), recommending referral to FIN. |
2017-03-21 | House | The committees on WAL recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 7 Ayes: Representative(s) Yamane, Kong, Cullen, Evans, C. Lee, Lowen, Say; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) Ichiyama, Fukumoto. |
2017-03-21 | House | The committees on OMH recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 7 Ayes: Representative(s) Ing, Gates, Creagan, DeCoite, LoPresti, Takayama, Thielen; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and Excused: none. |
2017-03-17 | House | Resolution scheduled to be heard by OMH/WAL on Tuesday, 03-21-17 9:35AM in conference room 312. |
2017-02-15 | House | Referred to OMH/WAL, FIN, referral sheet 20 |
2017-02-09 | House | Offered |
2017-02-08 | House | To be offered. |
Same As/Similar To
HCR42 (Carry Over) 2017-03-29 - Report adopted; referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Aquino, Oshiro, Say, Thielen excused (4).
Subjects
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=HCR&billnumber=42&year=2017 |
Text | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2017/bills/HCR42_.HTM |