HI HCR40 | 2023 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on April 20 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-05-04 - Received notice of Agreement and Adoption in House (Hse. Com. No. 898).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on April 20 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-05-04 - Received notice of Agreement and Adoption in House (Hse. Com. No. 898).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Requesting That The Hawaii Emergency Management Agency Establish A Two-year Task Force To Address Key Findings Validated By The 2022 Resiliency Assessment Report Of The Hawaii Maritime Transportation Regional Resiliency Assessment Program Project And Plan Resiliency Enhancements.
Title
Requesting That The Hawaii Emergency Management Agency Establish A Two-year Task Force To Address Key Findings Validated By The 2022 Resiliency Assessment Report Of The Hawaii Maritime Transportation Regional Resiliency Assessment Program Project And Plan Resiliency Enhancements.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-04-14 - Senate - Senate Public Safety, Intergovernmental and Military Affairs: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-05-04 | Senate | Received notice of Agreement and Adoption in House (Hse. Com. No. 898). |
2023-05-02 | House | Resolution adopted in final form. |
2023-05-02 | House | Adopted as amended in SD 1 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Quinlan excused (1). |
2023-05-02 | House | House agrees to Senate amendment(s). |
2023-04-28 | House | Deferred one day 05-02-23. |
2023-04-27 | House | One (1) day notice, Friday, 04-28-23. |
2023-04-20 | House | Returned from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 919) in amended form (SD 1). |
2023-04-20 | Senate | Report and Resolution Adopted, as amended (SD 1). Transmitted to House. |
2023-04-19 | Senate | One Day Notice 04-20-23. |
2023-04-19 | Senate | Reported from PSM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1920) with recommendation of adoption, as amended (SD 1). |
2023-04-14 | Senate | The committee(s) on PSM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in PSM were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Wakai, Elefante, McKelvey, Awa; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Fukunaga. |
2023-04-11 | Senate | The committee(s) on PSM has scheduled a public hearing on 04-14-23 3:31PM; Conference Room 225 & Videoconference. |
2023-04-11 | Senate | Referred to PSM. |
2023-04-06 | Senate | Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 632). |
2023-04-05 | House | Transmitted to Senate. |
2023-04-05 | House | Adopted with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Nishimoto, Yamashita excused (2). |
2023-04-05 | House | Reported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2004), recommending adoption. |
2023-04-03 | House | The committee on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 16 Ayes: Representative(s) Yamashita, Kitagawa, Aiu, Chun, Cochran, Garrett, Kahaloa, Kila, Kobayashi, Lamosao, Morikawa, Nishimoto, Poepoe, Takenouchi, Alcos; Ayes with reservations: Representative(s) Ward; 0 Noes: none; and 0 Excused: none. |
2023-03-31 | House | Scheduled for decision making on Monday, 04-03-23 2:00PM in conference room 308 VIA VIDEOCONFERENCE. |
2023-03-30 | House | Report adopted; referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Ilagan, Sayama, Woodson excused (3). |
2023-03-30 | House | Reported from WAL (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1716), recommending referral to FIN. |
2023-03-28 | House | The committee on WAL recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 8 Ayes: Representative(s) Ichiyama, Poepoe, Chun, Ganaden, Hashem, Morikawa, Takayama, Souza; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and Excused: none. |
2023-03-23 | House | Resolution scheduled to be heard by WAL on Tuesday, 03-28-23 9:30AM in conference room 430 VIA VIDEOCONFERENCE. |
2023-03-10 | House | Referred to WAL, FIN, referral sheet 18 |
2023-03-09 | House | Offered |
2023-03-08 | House | To be offered. |
Same As/Similar To
HR44 (Same As) 2023-04-05 - Resolution adopted in final form.
Subjects
Department of Transportation
Harbors Division
Hawaii Emergency Management Agency
Maritime Transportation System
Regional Resiliency Assessment Program
Report
Harbors Division
Hawaii Emergency Management Agency
Maritime Transportation System
Regional Resiliency Assessment Program
Report