HI HCR35 | 2018 | Regular Session

Note: Carryover of previous HCR35

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on February 16 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-03-19 - Report adopted; referred to the committee(s) on CPC with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Choy, DeCoite, Har, Kobayashi, Souki excused (5).
Pending: House Consumer Protection & Commerce Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Requesting The Auditor To Assess Both The Social And Financial Effects Of Proposed Mandated Health Insurance Coverage That Requires Insurers, Hospital And Medical Services Plans, And Health Maintenance Organizations To Provide Coverage For Medical Procedures To Eliminate Or Provide Maximum Feasible Treatment Of Port-wine Stains.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Requesting The Auditor To Assess Both The Social And Financial Effects Of Proposed Mandated Health Insurance Coverage That Requires Insurers, Hospital And Medical Services Plans, And Health Maintenance Organizations To Provide Coverage For Medical Procedures To Eliminate Or Provide Maximum Feasible Treatment Of Port-wine Stains.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2018-03-19HouseReport adopted; referred to the committee(s) on CPC with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Choy, DeCoite, Har, Kobayashi, Souki excused (5).
2018-03-19HouseReported from HHS (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1218-18), recommending referral to CPC.
2018-03-08HouseThe committees on HHS recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 5 Ayes: Representative(s) Mizuno, Kobayashi, Belatti, Learmont, Tupola; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and Excused: none.
2018-03-05HouseResolution scheduled to be heard by HHS on Thursday, 03-08-18 9:30AM in House conference room 312.
2018-03-01HouseReferred to HHS, CPC, FIN, referral sheet 31
2018-02-20HouseOffered
2018-02-16HouseTo be offered.

Same As/Similar To

HCR35 (Carry Over) 2017-05-02 - Resolution adopted in final form.

Subjects


Hawaii State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback