HI HCR35 | 2017 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 14-0)
Status: Passed on April 20 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-02 - Resolution adopted in final form.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Requesting The University Of Hawaii Center On Aging To Convene A Task Force To Assess Current Elder And Kupuna Care Services And The Anticipated Demand For Those Services In Order To Improve Those Services And Meet Anticipated Demand.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Requesting The University Of Hawaii Center On Aging To Convene A Task Force To Assess Current Elder And Kupuna Care Services And The Anticipated Demand For Those Services In Order To Improve Those Services And Meet Anticipated Demand.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2017-05-02HouseResolution adopted in final form.
2017-05-04SenateReceived notice of Adoption in House (Hse. Com. No. 644).
2017-05-02HouseAdopted as amended in SD 1 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Ichiyama, Tupola excused (2).
2017-05-02HouseHouse agrees to Senate amendment(s).
2017-04-20HouseReturned from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 686) in amended form (SD 1).
2017-04-20SenateReport and Resolution Adopted, as amended (SD 1). Transmitted to House.
2017-04-19SenateOne Day Notice 04-20-17.
2017-04-19SenateReported from HRE/HMS (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1657) with recommendation of adoption, as amended (SD 1).
2017-04-13SenateThe committee(s) on HMS recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in HMS were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) Green, S. Chang, Wakai; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Harimoto, Tokuda.
2017-04-13SenateThe committee(s) on HRE recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in HRE were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) K. Kahele, Espero, Taniguchi; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Kidani, Keith-Agaran.
2017-04-07SenateThe committee(s) on HRE/HMS has scheduled a public hearing on 04-13-17 9:00AM in conference room 225.
2017-03-31SenateReferred to HRE/HMS.
2017-03-31SenateReceived from House (Hse. Com. No. 384).
2017-03-30HouseTransmitted to Senate.
2017-03-30HouseAdopted as amended in HD 1 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Aquino, Creagan, Gates, Lowen, McDermott, Oshiro, Ward excused (7).
2017-03-30HouseReported from HED (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1548) as amended in HD 1, recommending adoption.
2017-03-28HouseThe committees on HED recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 8 Ayes: Representative(s) McKelvey, Hashem, Creagan, Ing, Ohno, Onishi, Woodson, Matsumoto; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Har.
2017-03-23HouseResolution scheduled to be heard by HED on Tuesday, 03-28-17 2:00PM in conference room 309.
2017-03-22HouseReport adopted; referred to the committee(s) on HED with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Ichiyama, C. Lee, Lowen excused (3).
2017-03-22HouseReported from HUS (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1221), recommending referral to HED.
2017-03-15HouseThe committees on HUS recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 5 Ayes: Representative(s) Morikawa, Todd, Har, Kobayashi, Oshiro; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) Belatti, Tupola.
2017-03-08HouseResolution scheduled to be heard by HUS on Wednesday, 03-15-17 9:30AM in conference room 329.
2017-03-08HouseThis measure has been deleted from the meeting scheduled on Friday 03-10-17 9:30AM in conference room 329.
2017-03-07HouseResolution scheduled to be heard by HUS on Friday, 03-10-17 9:30AM in House conference room 329.
2017-02-10HouseReferred to HUS, HED, referral sheet 16
2017-02-07HouseOffered
2017-02-06HouseTo be offered.

Same As/Similar To

SCR15 (Same As) 2017-04-20 - The committee(s) on HED recommend(s) that the measure be deferred.

Subjects


Hawaii State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback