HI HCR35 | 2014 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 27 2014 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-04-15 - Report adopted, as amended (SD 1) and referred to CPN.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Expressing The Support Of The Legislature Of The State Of Hawaii For The Troop Talent Act Of 2013.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Expressing support for the Troop Talent Act of 2013

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2014-04-15SenateReport adopted, as amended (SD 1) and referred to CPN.
2014-04-15SenateReported from PSM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 3418), as amended (SD 1), with recommendation of referral to CPN.
2014-04-10SenateThe committee(s) on PSM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in PSM were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Espero, Baker, Galuteria, Slom; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Green.
2014-04-03SenateThe committee(s) on PSM has scheduled a public hearing on 04-10-14 2:45PM in conference room 224.
2014-03-13SenateReferred to PSM, CPN.
2014-02-28SenateReceived from House (Hse. Com. No. 116).
2014-02-27HouseTransmitted to Senate.
2014-02-27HouseAdopted with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Har, Woodson excused (2).
2014-02-27HouseReported from VMI (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 677-14), recommending adoption.
2014-02-19HouseRe-referred to VMI, referral sheet 24
2014-02-12HouseThe committees on VMI recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 9 Ayes: Representative(s) Takai, Ito, Awana, Brower, Choy, Ohno, Onishi, Tsuji, Wooley; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) Cachola, McDermott.
2014-02-10HouseBroadcast of hearing/briefing available. See: www.capitoltv.org
2014-02-07HouseResolution scheduled to be heard by VMI on Wednesday, 02-12-14 8:30AM in conference room 312.
2014-02-05HouseReferred to VMI, FIN, referral sheet 16
2014-02-05HouseOffered
2014-02-04HouseTo be offered.

Same As/Similar To

HR18 (Same As) 2014-02-27 - Resolution adopted in final form.

Hawaii State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback