HI HCR34 | 2020 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous HCR34
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 43-5)
Status: Engrossed on February 27 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-02-28 - Referred to EET/TRS.
Pending: Senate Energy, Economic Development, and Tourism Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on February 27 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-02-28 - Referred to EET/TRS.
Pending: Senate Energy, Economic Development, and Tourism Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Requesting That The Wall Street Journal Include Hawaiian Airlines In The Newspaper's Future Rankings Of The Best And Worst Airlines In The United States.
Title
Requesting That The Wall Street Journal Include Hawaiian Airlines In The Newspaper's Future Rankings Of The Best And Worst Airlines In The United States.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-02-14 - House - House Tourism & International Affairs: Passed, Unamended (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-02-14 - House - House Transportation: Passed, Unamended (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-02-14 - House - House Transportation: Passed, Unamended (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-02-28 | Senate | Referred to EET/TRS. |
2020-02-28 | Senate | Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 13). |
2020-02-27 | House | Transmitted to Senate. |
2020-02-27 | House | Adopted with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Cabanilla Arakawa excused (1). |
2020-02-27 | House | Reported from TRN/TIA (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 797-20), recommending adoption. |
2020-02-14 | House | The committees on TIA recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 7 Ayes: Representative(s) Onishi, Holt, Cabanilla Arakawa, Cachola, DeCoite, Perruso, Okimoto; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Creagan. |
2020-02-14 | House | The committees on TRN recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 7 Ayes: Representative(s) Aquino, Hashimoto, Brower, Cullen, Matayoshi, Woodson, Okimoto; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Hashem. |
2020-02-11 | House | Resolution scheduled to be heard by TRN/TIA on Friday, 02-14-20 11:15AM in conference room 423. |
2020-01-31 | House | Referred to TRN/TIA, referral sheet 10 |
2020-01-31 | House | Offered |
2020-01-31 | House | To be offered. |
Same As/Similar To
HR18 (Same As) 2020-02-27 - Resolution adopted in final form.
HCR34 (Carry Over) 2019-03-07 - Referred to TIA, LHE, referral sheet 27
HCR34 (Carry Over) 2019-03-07 - Referred to TIA, LHE, referral sheet 27