HI HCR318 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on March 16 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-04-04 - (H) Report adopted. referred to the committee(s) on AGR as amended in HD 1 with none voting no and Carroll, M. Oshiro, Takai, Tokioka excused.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 16 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-04-04 - (H) Report adopted. referred to the committee(s) on AGR as amended in HD 1 with none voting no and Carroll, M. Oshiro, Takai, Tokioka excused.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Requesting The Department Of Hawaiian Home Lands To Convene A Task Force To Study The Feasibility Of Developing An Arena And Testing And Inspection Facility On Hawaiian Home Lands On Molokai For The Purpose Of Testing Backyard Poultry Flocks For Avian Diseases.
Title
Poultry Inspection; Avian Diseases; Hawaiian Home Lands
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-04-04 | (H) Report adopted. referred to the committee(s) on AGR as amended in HD 1 with none voting no and Carroll, M. Oshiro, Takai, Tokioka excused. | |
2011-04-04 | (H) Reported from HAW (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1331) as amended in HD 1, recommending referral to AGR. | |
2011-03-30 | (H) The committees on HAW recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 6 Ayes: Representative(s) Hanohano, C. Lee, Belatti, Jordan, Pine, Ward; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 4 Excused: Representative(s) Mizuno, Morikawa, Wooley, Yamane. | |
2011-03-24 | (H) Resolution scheduled to be heard by HAW on Wednesday, 03-30-11 8:30AM in conference room 329. | |
2011-03-21 | (H) Referred to HAW, AGR, FIN, referral sheet 43 | |
2011-03-16 | (H) Offered |
Same As/Similar To
HR283 (Same As) 2011-04-04 - (H) Report adopted. referred to the committee(s) on AGR as amended in HD 1 with none voting no and Carroll, M. Oshiro, Takai, Tokioka excused.