HI HCR3 | 2018 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous HCR3
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 18 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-03-28 - Report adopted. referred to the committee(s) on FIN as amended in HD 1 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Souki excused (1).
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 18 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-03-28 - Report adopted. referred to the committee(s) on FIN as amended in HD 1 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Souki excused (1).
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Requesting The Legislative Reference Bureau To Conduct A Study Of The Relevancy Of The Certificate Of Need Process Under Chapter 323d, Hawaii Revised Statutes.
Title
Requesting The Legislative Reference Bureau To Conduct A Study Of The Relevancy Of The Certificate Of Need Process Under Chapter 323d, Hawaii Revised Statutes.
Sponsors
Rep. Scott Saiki [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-28 | House | Report adopted. referred to the committee(s) on FIN as amended in HD 1 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Souki excused (1). |
2018-03-28 | House | Reported from HHS (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1705-18) as amended in HD 1, recommending referral to FIN. |
2018-03-08 | House | The committees on HHS recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 5 Ayes: Representative(s) Mizuno, Kobayashi, Belatti, Learmont, Tupola; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and Excused: none. |
2018-03-05 | House | Resolution scheduled to be heard by HHS on Thursday, 03-08-18 9:30AM in House conference room 312. |
2018-02-08 | House | Referred to HHS, FIN, referral sheet 18 |
2018-01-19 | House | Offered |
2018-01-18 | House | To be offered. |
Same As/Similar To
HCR3 (Carry Over) 2017-03-23 - The committee(s) on JUD recommend(s) that the measure be deferred.