HI HCR279 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 17-1)
Status: Engrossed on April 15 2011 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2011-04-19 - (S) Referred to EDU/HWN.
Pending: Senate Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on April 15 2011 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2011-04-19 - (S) Referred to EDU/HWN.
Pending: Senate Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Requesting The University Of Hawaii At Hilo To Seek Grant Moneys And Additional Resources For Studying The Feasibility Of Incorporating Native Hawaiian Plant Species In Capital Improvement Projects.
Title
Native Hawaiian Plants; Landscaping; UH Hilo
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-04-19 | (S) Referred to EDU/HWN. | |
2011-04-18 | (S) Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 645). | |
2011-04-15 | (H) Transmitted to Senate. | |
2011-04-15 | (H) Adopted with none voting no and Chong, Herkes, Kawakami, McKelvey, Thielen, Tokioka excused. | |
2011-04-15 | (H) Reported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1690), recommending adoption. | |
2011-04-13 | (H) The committees on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 12 Ayes: Representative(s) M. Oshiro, M. Lee, Choy, Cullen, Hashem, Ichiyama, Jordan, Kawakami, C. Lee, Morikawa, Tokioka, Yamashita; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 5 Excused: Representative(s) Chong, Har, Marumoto, Riviere, Ward. | |
2011-04-11 | (H) Scheduled for decision making on Wednesday, 04-13-11 10:30AM in conference room 308. | |
2011-04-05 | (H) Report adopted; referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting no and Carroll excused. | |
2011-04-05 | (H) Reported from HAW (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1374), recommending referral to FIN. | |
2011-04-04 | (H) The committees on HAW recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 6 Ayes: Representative(s) Hanohano, C. Lee, Mizuno, Morikawa, Wooley, Pine; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 4 Excused: Representative(s) Belatti, Jordan, Yamane, Ward. | |
2011-03-30 | (H) Resolution scheduled to be heard by HAW on Monday, 04-04-11 10:30AM in conference room 329. | |
2011-03-29 | (H) Report adopted; referred to the committee(s) on HAW with none voting no and Har, M. Oshiro excused. | |
2011-03-29 | (H) Reported from HED (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1228), recommending referral to HAW. | |
2011-03-24 | (H) The committees on HED recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 9 Ayes: Representative(s) Nishimoto, Nakashima, Aquino, Belatti, Chang, Saiki, Takai, Takumi, Johanson; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 5 Excused: Representative(s) Awana, Hanohano, Mizuno, Wooley, Ching. | |
2011-03-22 | (H) Resolution scheduled to be heard by HED on Thursday, 03-24-11 2:00PM in House conference room 309. | |
2011-03-21 | (H) Referred to HED, HAW, FIN, referral sheet 43 | |
2011-03-16 | (H) Offered |
Same As/Similar To
HR246 (Same As) 2011-04-15 - (H) Resolution adopted in final form.
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2011/lists/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=HCR&billnumber=279 |
Text | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2011/Bills/HCR279_.HTM |