HI HCR275 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 14 2011 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2011-04-18 - (S) Referred to PGM/JDL.
Pending: Senate Public Safety, Government Operations, and Military Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on April 14 2011 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2011-04-18 - (S) Referred to PGM/JDL.
Pending: Senate Public Safety, Government Operations, and Military Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Urging The City And County Of Honolulu To Provide Immunity From Liability For Neighborhood Board Members Acting In Their Official Capacity Or To Ensure That Neighborhood Board Members Will Be Defended.
Title
Immunity for Neighborhood Board Members.
Sponsors
Rep. Tom Brower [D] | Rep. Faye Hanohano [D] | Sen. Chris Lee [D] | Rep. Sylvia Luke [D] |
Rep. Daynette Morikawa [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-04-18 | (S) Referred to PGM/JDL. | |
2011-04-15 | (S) Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 581). | |
2011-04-14 | (H) Transmitted to Senate. | |
2011-04-14 | (H) Adopted with none voting no and Carroll, Chong, M. Oshiro, Say, Thielen excused. | |
2011-04-14 | (H) Reported from JUD (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1613), recommending adoption. | |
2011-04-07 | (H) The committees on JUD recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 12 Ayes: Representative(s) Keith-Agaran, Rhoads, Brower, Cabanilla, Coffman, Herkes, Luke, Souki, Tsuji, Fontaine, Marumoto, Thielen; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 4 Excused: Representative(s) Carroll, Ito, McKelvey, B. Oshiro. | |
2011-04-05 | (H) Resolution scheduled to be heard by JUD on Thursday, 04-07-11 2:00PM in conference room 325. | |
2011-03-21 | (H) Referred to JUD, referral sheet 43 | |
2011-03-16 | (H) Offered |
Same As/Similar To
HR242 (Same As) 2011-04-14 - (H) Resolution adopted in final form.
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2011/lists/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=HCR&billnumber=275 |
Text | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2011/Bills/HCR275_.HTM |