HI HCR263 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 28 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-04-28 - (H) Resolution adopted in final form.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 28 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-04-28 - (H) Resolution adopted in final form.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Urging The Use Of Certified Fire-retardant Coatings In Newly- Constructed One- And Two-family Residential Dwellings, And In Condominiums And Other High Rises That Do Not Have Sprinkler Systems.
Title
Fire Sprinklers; Fire-Retardant Coating; Dwellings
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-04-28 | (H) Resolution adopted in final form. | |
2011-04-28 | (H) Returned from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 684). | |
2011-04-28 | (S) Resolution Adopted. Transmitted to House. | |
2011-04-27 | (S) One Day Notice 04-28-11. | |
2011-04-27 | (S) Waived referral to PGM/WLH. | |
2011-04-19 | (S) Referred to PGM/WLH. | |
2011-04-18 | (S) Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 643). | |
2011-04-15 | (H) Transmitted to Senate. | |
2011-04-15 | (H) Adopted as amended in HD 2 with none voting no and Chong, Herkes, Kawakami, McKelvey, Thielen, Tokioka excused. | |
2011-04-15 | (H) Reported from HSG (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1623) as amended in HD 2, recommending adoption. | |
2011-04-13 | (H) The committees on HSG recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 7 Ayes: Representative(s) Cabanilla, Chang, Coffman, Herkes, Ito, Kawakami, Nakashima; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 5 Excused: Representative(s) Chong, Carroll, Har, Pine, Thielen. | |
2011-04-08 | (H) Resolution scheduled to be heard by HSG on Wednesday, 04-13-11 10:00AM in conference room 325. | |
2011-04-05 | (H) Report adopted. referred to the committee(s) on HSG as amended in HD 1 with none voting no and Carroll excused. | |
2011-04-05 | (H) Reported from PBM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1354) as amended in HD 1, recommending referral to HSG. | |
2011-03-24 | (H) The committees on PBM recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 9 Ayes: Representative(s) Aquino, Cullen, Ichiyama, M. Lee, Takai, Takumi, Yamashita, Fontaine, Johanson; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 3 Excused: Representative(s) Luke, Saiki, Souki. | |
2011-03-22 | (H) Resolution scheduled to be heard by PBM on Thursday, 03-24-11 10:30AM in conference room 309. | |
2011-03-21 | (H) Referred to PBM, HSG, referral sheet 43 | |
2011-03-16 | (H) Offered |
Same As/Similar To
HR225 (Same As) 2011-04-15 - (H) Resolution adopted in final form.